Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Coto Monge

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón

Titular Bishop of Bigastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1915BornCartago
9 Nov 194126.2Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
7 Mar 198064.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
7 Mar 198064.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bigastro
11 Apr 198064.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bigastro
30 Dec 199479.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
22 Jul 200690.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Coto Monge:
Bishop Alfonso Coto Monge (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Limón

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015