Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Ulloa Rojas

Bishop Emeritus of Cartago, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1940 Born
19 Dec 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
30 Dec 199454.2AppointedBishop of Limón, Costa Rica
22 Feb 199554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limón, Costa Rica
24 May 200564.6AppointedBishop of Cartago, Costa Rica
16 Jul 200564.7InstalledBishop of Cartago, Costa Rica
4 Mar 201776.4RetiredBishop of Cartago, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Ulloa Rojas
Bishop José Francisco Ulloa Rojas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCipreses de Oreamuno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cartago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,491
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Mar 2017