Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Gerardo Fernández Guillén

Bishop of Puntarenas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1949 BornSan Rafael de Oreamuno
8 Jul 197727.5Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
4 Jun 200353.5AppointedBishop of Puntarenas, Costa Rica
25 Jul 200353.6Ordained BishopBishop of Puntarenas, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Oscar Gerardo Fernández Guillén:
Bishop Oscar Gerardo Fernández Guillén (born ) Bishop of Puntarenas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puntarenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014