Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oswaldo Brenes Álvarez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Quesada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1942BornLiberia
18 Dec 196624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tilarán, Costa Rica
19 Mar 200865.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
24 May 200865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
31 Dec 201270.4ResignedBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
11 Feb 201370.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Oswaldo Brenes Álvarez:
Bishop Oswaldo Brenes Álvarez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Quesada

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,750
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2012
  • d: CB, 11 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013