Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Nazareno Trejos Picado

Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1928 BornGuadalupe de Cartago
8 Mar 195223.6Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
5 Jan 196839.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica
5 Jan 196839.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
8 Mar 196839.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
19 Dec 197446.4AppointedBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
31 Jul 200375.0RetiredBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Nazareno Trejos Picado:
Bishop Ignacio Nazareno Trejos Picado (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro de El General.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013