Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Troyo Calderón

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica

Titular Bishop of Burca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1923 BornCartago
30 Nov 194724.1Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
27 Aug 197955.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica
27 Aug 197955.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
21 Sep 197955.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Burca
13 Jul 200278.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Antonio Troyo Calderón:
Bishop Antonio Troyo Calderón (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013