Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolino Limongi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iran

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea Parva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1914BornBellona, Italy
18 Jul 193722.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 196348.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea Parva
15 Aug 196348.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
20 Oct 196348.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea Parva
9 Jul 196954.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iran
Mar 197156.2ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iran
5 Dec 199682.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Iran

MicroData Summary for Paolino Limongi:
Archbishop Paolino Limongi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Iran

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013