Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Capdevilla Ferrando, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1900Born
5 Apr 192423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
24 Mar 195352.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
24 Mar 195352.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
19 Jul 195352.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
12 Aug 196261.6DiedVicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Antonio Capdevilla Ferrando
Bishop Antonio Capdevilla Ferrando C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Pedro Sula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellpuig, Spain

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018