Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evelio Domínguez Recinos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Acholla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1910Born
22 Dec 193525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
11 Sep 195747.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
11 Sep 195747.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
27 Dec 195747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla
20 Apr 198878.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Evelio Domínguez Recinos
Bishop Evelio Domínguez Recinos (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcala

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018