Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Paul Aimé Gobel

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Calatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1943 BornThonon, France
29 Jun 196926.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199350.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Calatia
7 Dec 199350.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Armenia
7 Dec 199350.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Georgia
30 Dec 199350.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caucaso, Armenia
6 Jan 199450.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Calatia
15 Jan 199450.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Azerbaijan
29 Nov 199653.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Caucaso, Armenia
6 Dec 199754.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sénégal
6 Dec 199754.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
6 Dec 199754.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
6 Dec 199754.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
31 Oct 200158.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
10 Oct 200764.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iran
5 Jan 201369.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
3 Jan 201571.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Aimé Gobel:
Archbishop Jean-Paul Aimé Gobel (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Egypt, Arab Republic of.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,187
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2013
  • r: CB, 17 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015