Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Sócrates Sándigo Jirón

Bishop of León en Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1965 Born
11 Jul 199227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Granada, Nicaragua
28 Oct 200439.5AppointedBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
22 Jan 200539.7Ordained BishopBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
29 Jun 201954.1AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
24 Aug 201954.3InstalledBishop of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for René Sócrates Sándigo Jirón
Bishop René Sócrates Sándigo Jirón (born ) Bishop of León en Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiria, Diocese of Granada
Ordained BishopAsunción, Cathedral, Juigalpa, Diocese of Juigalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of León en Nicaragua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,810
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2019
  • i: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast