Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marcial Humberto Guzmán Saballo

Bishop-Elect of Juigalpa, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1965 Born
4 Dec 199328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Granada, Nicaragua
24 Sep 202055.6AppointedBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
5 Dec 202055.8Ordained BishopBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Marcial Humberto Guzmán Saballo
Father Marcial Humberto Guzmán Saballo (born ) Bishop-Elect of Juigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTola, Diocese of Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Juigalpa, Diocese of Juigalpa

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Juigalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2020
  • ob: CB, 4 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 4 Oct 2020

Quantcast