Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Tigerino Dávila

Bishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1963 Born
5 Jan 200238.2Ordained PriestPriest of León en Nicaragua
12 Nov 202057.0AppointedBishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
23 Jan 202157.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Tigerino Dávila
Bishop Francisco José Tigerino Dávila (born ) Bishop of Bluefields

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChinandega, Diocese of León en Nicaragua
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosariio, Cathedral, Bluefields, Diocese of Bluefields

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bluefields.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 1 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Jan 2021

Quantcast