Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Baldacchino

Bishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1960 Born
25 May 199635.4Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Feb 201453.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
20 Feb 201453.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
19 Mar 201453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
15 May 201958.4AppointedBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA
23 Jul 201958.6InstalledBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Baldacchino
Bishop Peter Baldacchino (born ) Bishop of Las Cruces

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSliema, Malta
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Miami, Archdiocese of Miami, Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Las Cruces.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,117
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2019
  • i: CB, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 May 2019

Quantcast