Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Hampden Dickson

Bishop Emeritus of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1935 Born
11 Feb 196226.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 197034.9AppointedBishop of Bridgetown-Kingstown, Barbados, Antilles
29 Jan 197135.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bridgetown-Kingstown, Barbados, Antilles
23 Apr 199559.4ResignedBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Anthony Hampden Dickson
Bishop Anthony Hampden Dickson (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bridgetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingston in Jamaica
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Church, Bridgetown, Diocese of Bridgetown-Kingstown, Barbados

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bridgetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast