Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Michel Ellis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1926BornWillemstad
24 Oct 195327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
7 Aug 197346.8AppointedBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
25 Nov 197347.1Ordained BishopBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
11 Oct 200175.0RetiredBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
24 Sep 200377.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Michel Ellis:
Bishop Wilhelm Michel Ellis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Willemstad

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013