Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Antonio Secco, S.D.B.

Bishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1947 BornPiazzola sul Brenta, Italy
27 Apr 197527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jun 200053.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
28 Oct 200053.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
11 Oct 200154.3SucceededBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Luigi Antonio Secco
Bishop Luigi Antonio Secco S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Willemstad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Willemstad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Sep 2016