Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique José Parravano Marino, S.D.B.

Bishop of Maracay, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1955 Born
30 Aug 198024.8Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Jan 198428.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Apr 201660.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
27 Apr 201660.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
9 Jul 201660.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
19 Jul 201963.6AppointedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
28 Sep 201963.8InstalledBishop of Maracay, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Enrique José Parravano Marino
Bishop Enrique José Parravano Marino S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Maracay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurmero, Diocese of Maracay
Ordained BishopTemplo Nacional San Juan Bosco, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maracay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 19 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,058
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2019
  • i: AM, 4 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast