Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jorge Liberato Cardinal Urosa Savino

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1942 BornCaracas
15 Aug 196724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
3 Jul 198239.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
3 Jul 198239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
22 Sep 198240.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
16 Mar 199047.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
25 May 199047.7InstalledArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
19 Sep 200563.0AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
5 Nov 200563.1InstalledArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
24 Mar 200663.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200663.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria ai Monti
2 Jul 200663.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria ai Monti

MicroData Summary for Jorge Liberato Urosa Savino:
Jorge Liberato Cardinal Urosa Savino (born ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015