Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Sótero Valero Ruz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guanare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1936BornTimotes
16 May 196428.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 199862.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela
9 May 199862.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
27 Jun 199862.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba
19 Mar 200164.9AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
12 Oct 201175.4RetiredBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
29 Jun 201276.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Guanare, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Sótero Valero Ruz:
Bishop José Sótero Valero Ruz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guanare

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,348
  • d: CB, 29 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015