Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Rafael Padrón Sánchez

Archbishop Emeritus of Cumaná, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1939 Born
4 Aug 196324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
4 Apr 199050.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Apr 199050.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
27 May 199051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
7 May 199454.9AppointedBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
23 Jul 199455.1InstalledBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
27 Mar 200262.8AppointedArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
24 May 201879.0RetiredArchbishop of Cumaná, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Diego Rafael Padrón Sánchez
Archbishop Diego Rafael Padrón Sánchez (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cumaná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalbán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cumaná.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast