Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Armando Tineo Rivera

Bishop of Carora, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1948 Born
26 Jul 198032.2Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Feb 200758.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Feb 200758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
28 Apr 200758.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
23 Jul 201365.2AppointedBishop of Carora, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Luis Armando Tineo Rivera
Bishop Luis Armando Tineo Rivera (born ) Bishop of Carora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,410
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018