Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón José Viloria Pinzón, S.O.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Cabello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1959 BornSan Felipe
28 Oct 199031.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 200344.7AppointedBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela
7 Feb 200444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela
13 Mar 201050.9ResignedBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ramón José Viloria Pinzón:
Bishop Ramón José Viloria Pinzón S.O.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Cabello

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Cabello.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,524
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013