Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ángel Divassón Cilveti, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Ayacucho

Titular Bishop of Bamaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1939 BornArtajona, Spain
11 Feb 196525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Feb 199656.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
23 Feb 199656.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
4 May 199657.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
14 Oct 201576.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Ángel Divassón Cilveti:
Bishop José Ángel Divassón Cilveti S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Ayacucho

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,745
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016