Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Henriquez Andueza, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Maracay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1928BornValencia
17 Dec 195527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jun 198052.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barinas, Venezuela
26 Jun 198052.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiana
27 Sep 198052.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiana
198556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
24 Jun 198759.4AppointedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
5 Feb 200375.0RetiredBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
14 Jul 200577.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Maracay, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Henriquez Andueza:
Bishop José Vicente Henriquez Andueza S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Maracay

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015