Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John Feeney, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Agnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1894Born
23 Jun 192732.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 May 195156.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
10 May 195156.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Agnus
8 Sep 195157.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agnus
9 Sep 195561.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Feeney
Bishop Thomas John Feeney S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJamaica Plain, USA

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018