Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lambert Anthony Hoch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls, South Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1903BornElkton
30 May 192825.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 195248.9AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
25 Mar 195249.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
27 Nov 195653.8AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
5 Dec 195653.8InstalledBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
13 Jun 197875.3RetiredBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
27 Jun 199087.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Lambert Anthony Hoch:
Bishop Lambert Anthony Hoch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015