Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Joseph Kettler

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

Administrator of Sioux Falls, South Dakota

Note(s): ("Temporary Adminisrator")


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1944 Born
29 May 197025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
21 May 200257.4AppointedBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
22 Aug 200257.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
20 Sep 201368.8AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
7 Nov 201368.9InstalledBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
15 Dec 202278.0RetiredBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
1 May 202580.4AppointedAdministrator of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary
Donald Joseph Kettler
Bishop Donald Joseph Kettler
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinneapolis, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Sioux Falls, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota
Ordained BishopCarlson Center, Fairbanks, Diocese of Fairbanks, Alaska

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Cloud.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,241
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2013
  • c1: CB, 16 May 2022
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2022
  • tadm: CB, 4 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 5 May 2025