Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Joseph Grimmelsman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evansville, Indiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Tabla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1890Born
15 Aug 191524.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 194453.8AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
21 Dec 194453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
18 Oct 196574.8RetiredBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
18 Oct 196574.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabla
26 Jun 197281.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Evansville, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Grimmelsman
Bishop Henry Joseph Grimmelsman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evansville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,944, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast