Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Geiger, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Xingu, Para, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1900Born
29 Jun 193030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
17 Jan 194847.9AppointedPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
17 Jan 194847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
19 May 194848.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
26 Apr 197171.2ResignedPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
14 Jun 199595.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Xingu, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Clemente Geiger
Bishop Clemente Geiger C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Xingu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeuterschach, Germany

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018