Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Paul

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1918Born
24 Jan 194324.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
17 May 197758.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
17 May 197758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
4 Aug 197758.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
14 Oct 198365.1AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
5 Dec 198365.3InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
10 Dec 199476.3RetiredBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
5 Mar 200687.5DiedBishop Emeritus of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Paul
Bishop John Joseph Paul (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Crosse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Crosse

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018