Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Joseph O’Neill

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1917BornEast Dubuque
27 Mar 194325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rockford, Illinois, USA
19 Aug 196850.6AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
11 Oct 196850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
19 Apr 199476.3RetiredBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
27 Apr 201395.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Joseph O’Neill:
Bishop Arthur Joseph O’Neill (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockford

  • a priest for 70.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/i/d: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015