Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Nicholas Wurm

Deceased

Bishop of Belleville, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1927BornSaint Louis
3 Apr 195426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
25 Jun 197648.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
25 Jun 197648.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
17 Aug 197648.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia
19 Sep 198153.8AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
4 Nov 198153.9InstalledBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
27 Apr 198456.4DiedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Nicholas Wurm:
Bishop John Nicholas Wurm (born , died ) Bishop of Belleville

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013