Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vincent Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana


Graphics images used by permission of Diocese of Baton Rouge

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1919BornKansas City
1 Jun 194626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
4 Mar 196747.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
4 Mar 196747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
3 Apr 196747.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
8 Aug 197454.9AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
4 Sep 198263.0DiedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vincent Sullivan:
Bishop Joseph Vincent Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop of Baton Rouge

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015