Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hubert Hart

Bishop Emeritus of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1931 Born
1 May 195624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
1 Jul 197644.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
1 Jul 197644.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
31 Aug 197644.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
25 Apr 197846.5AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
12 Jun 197846.7InstalledBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
26 Sep 200170.0ResignedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hubert Hart
Bishop Joseph Hubert Hart (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cheyenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKansas City, MO, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cheyenne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast