Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Danglmayr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas

Titular Bishop of Olba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1898BornMuenster, TX
10 Jun 192223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
24 Apr 194243.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
24 Apr 194243.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
7 Oct 194243.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
22 Aug 196970.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
18 Sep 199293.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustine Danglmayr:
Bishop Augustine Danglmayr (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dallas

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013