Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Jarboe Sheehan

Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1939 BornWichita, KS
12 Jul 196425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA
25 Mar 198343.7AppointedBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA
17 Jun 198343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA
6 Apr 199353.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
17 Aug 199354.1AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
21 Sep 199354.2InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
18 Jun 200363.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
25 Nov 200364.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Phoenix, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Jarboe Sheehan:
Archbishop Michael Jarboe Sheehan (born ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014