Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Sean Wall

Bishop of Gallup, New Mexico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1964 BornGanado
6 Jun 199833.7Ordained PriestPriest of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
5 Feb 200944.3AppointedBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
23 Apr 200944.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for James Sean Wall:
Bishop James Sean Wall (born ) Bishop of Gallup

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gallup.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013