Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leroy Theodore Matthiesen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1921BornOlfen
10 Mar 194624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Amarillo, Texas, USA
18 Mar 198058.8AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
30 May 198059.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
21 Jan 199775.6RetiredBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
22 Mar 201088.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Amarillo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Leroy Theodore Matthiesen:
Bishop Leroy Theodore Matthiesen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013