Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jeffrey Neil Steenson

Ordinary Emeritus of The Chair of Saint Peter

Titular See: (Monsignor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1952 BornCamp Rucker, AL
1 Dec 200755.6Converted
13 Dec 200856.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
21 Feb 200956.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
1 Jan 201259.7AppointedOrdinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA
12 Feb 201259.8InstalledOrdinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA
24 Nov 201563.6ResignedOrdinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA

MicroData Summary for Jeffrey Neil Steenson:
Father Jeffrey Neil Steenson (born ) Ordinary Emeritus of The Chair of Saint Peter

Please contact the Father through the Personal Ordinariate of The Chair of Saint Peter.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jan 2012
  • conv/c01: CB, 1 Jan 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Nov 2015