Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Edward Strickland

Bishop of Tyler, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1958 BornFredericksburg
8 Dec 198426.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dallas, Texas, USA
1 Jun 198526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
24 Feb 198728.3IncardinatedPriest of Tyler, Texas, USA
29 Sep 201253.9AppointedBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
28 Nov 201254.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edward Strickland:
Bishop Joseph Edward Strickland (born ) Bishop of Tyler

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tyler.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2012
  • od/op/ob/c0+: Website of the Diocese, 29 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013