Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Brennan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1853BornBallycullen, Ireland
14 Jul 188026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jan 189137.2AppointedBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
5 Apr 189137.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
17 Nov 189239.1ResignedBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
1 Feb 189339.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
7 Oct 190552.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
7 Oct 190552.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
20 Mar 191662.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Brennan:
Bishop Thomas Francis Brennan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015