Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Huston Ricard, S.S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1940 BornNew Roads, LA
25 May 196828.2Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Society of the Sacred Heart
25 May 198444.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
25 May 198444.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rucuma
2 Jul 198444.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rucuma
20 Jan 199756.9AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
11 Mar 201171.0ResignedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Huston Ricard:
Bishop John Huston Ricard S.S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pensacola-Tallahassee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pensacola-Tallahassee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013