Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peregrin de la Fuente Néstar, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Mylasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1899Born
10 Jun 192425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Jul 195152.1AppointedPrelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines
2 Jul 195152.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
29 Sep 195152.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
14 May 196667.0DiedPrelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Peregrin de la Fuente Néstar
Bishop Peregrin de la Fuente Néstar O.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmayuelas, Spain

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,951, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast