Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rufino Jiao Cardinal Santos

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria ai Monti

Bishop of Philippines, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1908BornGuagua, Pampanga
25 Oct 193123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
19 Aug 194739.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
19 Aug 194739.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
24 Oct 194739.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
1950²41.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lipa, Philippines
30 May 195041.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Infanta, Philippines
21 Dec 195042.3AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
10 Feb 195344.5AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Mar 195344.6InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
28 Mar 196051.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 196051.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria ai Monti
3 Sep 197365.0DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rufino Jiao Santos:
Rufino Jiao Cardinal Santos (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Mar 1960
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 110
  • i/manp: CB, 29 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014