Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando Izquierdo Antiporda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

Titular Bishop of Edessa in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1914BornBinangonan
20 Dec 193622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
19 Aug 195440.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
19 Aug 195440.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Edessa in Macedonia
28 Oct 195440.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Edessa in Macedonia
13 Dec 197561.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Hernando Izquierdo Antiporda:
Bishop Hernando Izquierdo Antiporda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 17 Aug 2015