Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Paz Perez

Deceased

Bishop of Imus, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1920Born
9 Apr 195534.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
25 Feb 196948.6AppointedBishop of Imus, Philippines
27 May 196948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Imus, Philippines
29 Feb 199271.6DiedBishop of Imus, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Felix Paz Perez
Bishop Felix Paz Perez (born , died ) Bishop of Imus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila, Archdiocese of Manila
Ordained BishopManila, Archdiocese of Manila
Death PlaceDe La Salle University, Hospital, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Imus, Diocese of Imus

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 May 2020

Quantcast