Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Artemio Gabriel Casas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Jaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1911BornMeycauayan
20 Mar 193826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
11 Dec 196150.1AppointedBishop of Imus, Philippines
24 Feb 196250.3Ordained BishopBishop of Imus, Philippines
4 Sep 196856.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
4 Sep 196856.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
11 May 197462.5AppointedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines
24 Oct 198574.0ResignedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines
29 Mar 198977.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Artemio Gabriel Casas:
Archbishop Artemio Gabriel Casas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Jaro

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 16
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 287
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 21 Jul 2015