Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amado Paulino y Hernandez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Carinola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1918Born
21 Sep 194628.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 196950.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Feb 196950.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carinola
27 May 196950.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carinola
9 Mar 198566.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Amado Paulino y Hernandez
Bishop Amado Paulino y Hernandez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarasoain-Bustos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jul 2020

Quantcast