Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Charles Byrne, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iba, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1913Born
21 Dec 193724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
20 Aug 195643.5AppointedPrelate of Iba, Philippines
20 Aug 195643.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamia
29 Oct 195643.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamia
4 Nov 195643.7InstalledPrelate of Iba, Philippines
15 Nov 198269.7AppointedBishop of Iba, Philippines
16 Jul 198370.4ResignedBishop of Iba, Philippines
24 Jul 198370.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Iba, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Henry Charles Byrne
Bishop Henry Charles Byrne S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdenderry, Ireland

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 99
  • i: CB, 1 Aug 2015
  • mi/c1: CB, 10 Aug 2015
  • mn: CB, 11 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018